TX HB1699 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Evergreen Underground Water Conservation District to impose certain fees.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Evergreen Underground Water Conservation District to impose certain fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy King [D] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1889 (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#130 (Y: 118 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#122 (Y: 124 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#130 (Y: 118 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#122 (Y: 124 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-09 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-19 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1889 |
2023-05-19 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#130 |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed |
2023-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-10 | House | Record vote RV#122 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1085 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Local Government
SB1085 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Local Government
SB1085 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
EVERGREEN UNDERGROUND WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility