TX HB1642 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to reporting requirements for investigations of abuse, neglect, or exploitation against residents of certain health facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reporting requirements for investigations of abuse, neglect, or exploitation against residents of certain health facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-24HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-02-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback