TX HB1641 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of specially marked driver's licenses and personal identification certificates to disabled veterans.
Title
Relating to the issuance of specially marked driver's licenses and personal identification certificates to disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS