TX HB1638 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to statewide goals for dual credit programs provided by school districts.
Title
Relating to statewide goals for dual credit programs provided by school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
TECHNICAL EDUCATION