TX HB1637 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the professions regulated by the Texas Real Estate Commission.
Title
Relating to the professions regulated by the Texas Real Estate Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-22 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
CRIMINAL RECORDS
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
REAL ESTATE BROKERS
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
CRIMINAL RECORDS
GIFTS & DONATIONS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
REAL ESTATE BROKERS
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1637 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01637I.htm |