TX HB1622 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the personal needs allowance for certain Medicaid recipients who are residents of long-term care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the personal needs allowance for certain Medicaid recipients who are residents of long-term care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1079 (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateReferred to Finance
2017-05-17SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-03-06HouseRead first time
2017-02-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback