TX HB1619 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to court reporters and shorthand reporting firms; imposing a fee; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to court reporters and shorthand reporting firms; imposing a fee; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Art Fierro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#798 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#798 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2094 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Courts
Courts--Reporters
Intergovernmental Relations
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
SUPREME COURT
Courts
Courts--Reporters
Intergovernmental Relations
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
SUPREME COURT