TX HB16 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the ethics of public servants, including the authority and duties of the Texas Ethics Commission, the regulation of certain contributions and expenditures, and the reporting of political contributions and political expenditures and personal financial information; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the ethics of public servants, including the authority and duties of the Texas Ethics Commission, the regulation of certain contributions and expenditures, and the reporting of political contributions and political expenditures and personal financial information; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-08-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-08-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-08-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-08-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-08-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-08-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-08-02 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-08-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-08-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB16 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00016I.htm |