TX HB1515 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the expiration of the dry cleaner environmental response program.
Title
Relating to the expiration of the dry cleaner environmental response program.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Elkins [R] | Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#921 (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Returned to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-04-13 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-03-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Environment--Air
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON