TX HB1481 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] |
Rep. Larry Phillips [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - HB 1481Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-08 - House - HB 1481Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-08 - House - HB 1481Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed |