TX HB1457 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to fantasy sports contests.
Title
Relating to fantasy sports contests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions