TX HB1414 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voting procedures for certain federal postcard applicants and military personnel serving overseas.
Title
Relating to voting procedures for certain federal postcard applicants and military personnel serving overseas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#631 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-02-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--Voting Systems
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans
SECRETARY OF STATE
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--Voting Systems
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans
SECRETARY OF STATE