TX HB1409 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the minimum patient age for administration of an influenza vaccination by a pharmacist.
Title
Relating to the minimum patient age for administration of an influenza vaccination by a pharmacist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-20 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Passed | |
2009-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Record vote | |
2009-04-09 | Passed | |
2009-04-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-09 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-03-31 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-24 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-18 | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--General
IMMUNIZATIONS
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
Health--General
IMMUNIZATIONS
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS