TX HB1385 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to criminal history record information by county offices providing pretrial release services.
Title
Relating to access to criminal history record information by county offices providing pretrial release services.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1108 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#1108 |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-04 | House | Amended 1-Moody |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF