TX HB1348 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a municipality to regulate veterinarians.
Title
Relating to the authority of a municipality to regulate veterinarians.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1355 (Y: 109 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1292 (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1292 (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1355 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1292 |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-16 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-15 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
VETERINARIANS
City Government--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
VETERINARIANS