TX HB1348 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain insurance practices with respect to repair of motor vehicles.
Title
Relating to certain insurance practices with respect to repair of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Rep. Julie Johnson [D] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment