TX HB133 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the payment of gratuities to certain employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the payment of gratuities to certain employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#851 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-01HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01HouseRecord vote RV#851
2019-05-01HousePassed
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-02-13HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback