TX HB1307 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the care of pregnant women in county jail or in the custody of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the care of pregnant women in county jail or in the custody of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-08 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#417
2021-04-23HousePassed
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-12HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Corrections
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB806 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1307
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01307I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01307H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01307E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01307S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01307F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01307I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01307H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01307H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01307E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01307E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1307&RcdVtNo=417&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=19

Bill Comments

feedback