TX HB1302 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-26 - Referred to Ways & Means
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-26 - Referred to Ways & Means
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain school districts to enter into property tax abatement agreements in connection with realigned or closed military facilities.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain school districts to enter into property tax abatement agreements in connection with realigned or closed military facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-26 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB756 (Same As) 2009-04-27 - Left pending in committee
HB1842 (Same As) 2009-03-04 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1842 (Same As) 2009-03-04 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Military & Veterans
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District