TX HB1288 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the carrying and possession of a handgun by a public junior college school marshal.
Title
Relating to the carrying and possession of a handgun by a public junior college school marshal.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] |
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed |