TX HB1268 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the computation of public high school grade point averages.
Title
Relating to the computation of public high school grade point averages.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Rep. Rob Eissler [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Rep. Diane Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum