TX HB1243 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the identification and handling of unclaimed life insurance and annuity contract proceeds.
Title
Relating to the identification and handling of unclaimed life insurance and annuity contract proceeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Insurance--Life & Annuities
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY