TX HB1238 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the school health and related services program, including parental consent for program services, the establishment of a school health and related services program advisory council, and the publication of the School Health and Related Services (SHARS) Handbook portion of the Texas Medicaid Provider Procedures Manual.
Title
Relating to the school health and related services program, including parental consent for program services, the establishment of a school health and related services program advisory council, and the publication of the School Health and Related Services (SHARS) Handbook portion of the Texas Medicaid Provider Procedures Manual.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#617 (Y: 123 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#617 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL CONSENT
SCHOOL HEALTH & RELATED SERVICES PROGRAM ADVISORY COUNCIL
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDICAID
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PARENTAL CONSENT
SCHOOL HEALTH & RELATED SERVICES PROGRAM ADVISORY COUNCIL
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed