TX HB1226 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs of a pilot program to solicit donations made by text message for the benefit of local programs that provide services to homeless individuals and families in certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs of a pilot program to solicit donations made by text message for the benefit of local programs that provide services to homeless individuals and families in certain municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback