TX HB1107 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal liability for certain federal motor carrier safety violations; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to criminal liability for certain federal motor carrier safety violations; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - HB 1107Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration