TX HB11 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to pregnancy-related deaths and maternal morbidity, including postpartum depression.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to pregnancy-related deaths and maternal morbidity, including postpartum depression.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-01 - House - Amended RV#30 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - House - Record vote RV#25 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - House - RV#24 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-01HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-01HouseRecord vote
2017-08-01HousePassed as amended
2017-08-01HouseAmended
2017-08-01HouseAmended
2017-08-01HouseRead 3rd time
2017-07-31HouseRecord vote
2017-07-31HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-07-31HouseRecord vote
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseAmended
2017-07-31HouseRead 2nd time
2017-07-31HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-07-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-07-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback