TX HB108 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the rate at which interest accrues in connection with the deferral or abatement of the collection of ad valorem taxes on certain residence homesteads.
Title
Relating to the rate at which interest accrues in connection with the deferral or abatement of the collection of ad valorem taxes on certain residence homesteads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#63 (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#55 (Y: 45 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-08-03 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#55 (Y: 45 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-08-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-08-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-04 | House | Passed |
2017-08-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-03 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-03 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-08-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-03 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-08-03 | House | Amended |
2017-08-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-08-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection