TX HB1076 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the mandatory spinal screening of public and private school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the mandatory spinal screening of public and private school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#667 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-16SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback