TX HB1055 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on the amount of certain licensing fees charged by state agencies.
Title
Relating to a limitation on the amount of certain licensing fees charged by state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#911 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Amended RV#857 (Y: 122 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Amended RV#857 (Y: 122 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Legislature
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Legislature
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions