TX HB1002 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the membership of a public school concussion oversight team and the removal of a public school student from an interscholastic athletic activity on the basis of a suspected concussion.
Title
Relating to the membership of a public school concussion oversight team and the removal of a public school student from an interscholastic athletic activity on the basis of a suspected concussion.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
Rep. Ken King [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#681 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-21 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHIROPRACTIC & CHIROPRACTORS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY & OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
OCCUPATIONAL THERAPY & OCCUPATIONAL THERAPISTS
PHYSICAL THERAPISTS