TN SR0067 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Mary Scales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mary Scales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-06SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2014-02-06SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2014-02-06SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2014-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/6/2014
2014-02-03SenateP2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2014-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback