TN SR0044 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Janice Hamil, Rob Edgerton Ambassador of the Year
Title
Janice Hamil, Rob Edgerton Ambassador of the Year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-03-24 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-03-23 | R/S Adopted v.v. | |
2009-03-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-03-17 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SR0044&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SR0044.pdf |