TN SR0008 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Detective Stephanie Cisco, 2010 Award for Excellence in Law Enforcement
Title
Detective Stephanie Cisco, 2010 Award for Excellence in Law Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/3/2011 | |
2011-02-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-02-24 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-23 | Filed for intro. |