TN SJR8009 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
R. Larry Smith, NAIFA-Tennessee 2020 Insurance Professional of the Year
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend R. Larry Smith upon being named the NAIFA-Tennessee 2020 Insurance Professional of the Year.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-10-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-20 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-10-20 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. No. 2 for 10/20/21 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/20/2021 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |