TN SJR1862 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sigma Kappa Chapter of Chi Omega Women's Fraternity, 50th anniversary
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize the Sigma Kappa Chapter of Chi Omega Women's Fraternity on the occasion of its fiftieth anniversary.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-28 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR1862&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SJR1862.pdf |