TN SJR1675 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Judge James "Jim" G. Martin III
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize and commend the Honorable James "Jim" G. Martin III upon his exemplary tenure as Circuit Court Judge and Chancellor, Division II for the 21st Judicial District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/27/22 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |