TN SJR1012 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jeremy Nagoshiner, Heritage Conservation Trust Fund Board
Title
Jeremy Nagoshiner, Heritage Conservation Trust Fund Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR1012&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SJR1012.pdf |