TN SJR0990 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Deputy Shelby Eggers
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor Deputy Shelby Eggers of the Blount County Sheriff's Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |