TN SJR0915 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Calls joint convention to hear State of the State address by Governor Lee; authorizes transmittal of budget document by February 5, 2024, and filing of legislation implementing the budget by February 9, 2024.
Title
A RESOLUTION to call a joint convention of the Senate and House of Representatives for the purpose of hearing a State of the State address by Governor Bill Lee and to authorize transmittal of the budget document and legislation implementing the budget for fiscal year 2024-2025.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-01-31 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-01-31 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0915&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SJR0915.pdf |