TN SJR0906 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports Texas in efforts to secure its border and affirms each state's constitutional right of self-defense.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to the States' constitutional right of self-defense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-02-12 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 6 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/8/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/6/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |