TN SJR0882 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Kim H. White, UT board of trustees
Title
Kim H. White, UT board of trustees
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Education Committee 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |