TN SJR0849 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
James Haltom, Claims Commission
Title
James Haltom, Claims Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |