TN SJR0845 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Charles Hankla, Heritage Conservation Trust Fund Board
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Charles Hankla to the Heritage Conservation Trust Fund Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-02-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-02-12 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/8/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |