TN SJR0843 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
John Hie, Tennessee Public Utility Commission
Title
John Hie, Tennessee Public Utility Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |