TN SJR0686 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
First Sergeant Nelton H. Galloway, Commander's Award for Public Service
Title
First Sergeant Nelton H. Galloway, Commander's Award for Public Service
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-03-31 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/4/16 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |