TN SJR0641 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Thelma Harper
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Senator Thelma Harper of Nashville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/28/21 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |