TN SJR0619 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the Commissioner of the Department of Health to designate Alzheimer's disease and other related dementias as a public health issue.
Title
Urges the Commissioner of the Department of Health to designate Alzheimer's disease and other related dementias as a public health issue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-25 | House | Concurred, Ayes 81, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-04-18 | House | Intro., ref. to Health Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Failed in Delayed Bill Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 3-7-18 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |