TN SJR0525 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Bart Walker, 2011 Leadership Rutherford Pinnacle Award
Title
Bart Walker, 2011 Leadership Rutherford Pinnacle Award
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-02-03 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-02-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-02-03 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-02-02 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-02-02 | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 1 | |
2012-02-01 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/02/12 | |
2012-02-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-02-01 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |