TN SJR0494 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes additional language in Article II, Section 28 to prohibit the general assembly from levying or permitting any state or local tax upon income derived from stocks and bonds that are not taxed ad valorem.
Title
Proposes additional language in Article II, Section 28 to prohibit the general assembly from levying or permitting any state or local tax upon income derived from stocks and bonds that are not taxed ad valorem.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-26 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 3 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Second Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/15/2018 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/15/2018 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/6/2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/30/2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |