TN SJR0482 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Ref. to State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Ref. to State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes February 10, 1954, as the anniversary of the addition of the words, “under God,” to the United States Pledge of Allegiance.
Title
Recognizes February 10, 1954, as the anniversary of the addition of the words, “under God,” to the United States Pledge of Allegiance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |